GA HB39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapters 39A and 40 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to real estate appraisers and real estate brokers and salespersons, respectively, so as to change certain provisions relating to disciplinary actions and sanctions permitted for failure of such real estate professionals to provide notification of convictions of certain offenses; to require notification of convictions within a certain time frame; to provide for revocation of a real estate professional's license or classification under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate professionals; disciplinary actions and sanctions; change certain provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #189 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Vote #29 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 40
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback