GA HB386 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Pierce County and to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for definitions; to provide for the composition of the board and the selection and appointment of members; to provide for the qualification, terms, and removal of members; to provide for oaths and privileges; to provide for meetings, procedures, and vacancies; to relieve certain officers of powers and duties and to provide for the transfer of functions to the newly created board; to provide for submission under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pierce County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #294 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-18 - House - House Vote #54 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-02-18 - House - House Vote #54 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 296 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-18 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-11 | House First Readers |