GA HB383 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general authority, duties, and procedure relative to state purchasing, so as to prohibit the state from entering into certain contracts with an individual or company unless such contracts contain a certification that such individual or company does not presently conduct a boycott of Israel and will not conduct such a boycott for the duration of such contract; to exclude certain contracts from these requirements; to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; certain contracts; Israel; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] |
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #463 (Y: 146 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #382 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #197 (Y: 150 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #382 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #197 (Y: 150 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-02-21 | Act 515 | |
2022-02-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-18 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-01-27 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hopper |