GA HB381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to landlord and tenant, so as to enact a new article to provide for the classification of abandoned mobile homes as derelict or intact for purposes of disposal or creation of liens; to provide for procedure for requesting classification of an abandoned mobile home as intact or derelict; to provide for notice; to provide for creation of a lien on abandoned mobile homes deemed to be intact; to provide the opportunity for a hearing to confirm classification as a derelict abandoned mobile home; to provide for court authority to order the disposal of abandoned mobile homes found to be derelict; to provide for the voluntary discharge of a tax lien upon a derelict mobile home by the state or a local governing authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned Mobile Home Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #836 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #627 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #513 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 428
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-19SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-19SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback