GA HB380 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state government, so as to authorize and provide for the regulation and taxation of sports betting in this state; to provide for additional powers and duties of the Georgia Lottery Corporation; to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to gambling, so as to exclude any consideration paid to a sports betting licensee from the definition of "bet"; to provide for the exemption of persons licensed for online sports betting from regulations and restrictions regarding gambling information; to amend Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to revenue and taxation, so as to exempt wagers placed as part of sports betting; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Lottery Game of Sports Betting Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] |
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hopper |