GA HB370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-34-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to delegation of certain medical acts to advanced practice registered nurses, so as to revise the exception to the number of advanced practice registered nurses with which a delegating physician can enter into a protocol agreement for nurses practicing in an emergency medical services system; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; number of advanced practice registered nurses with which a delegating physician can enter into a protocol agreement for nurses practicing in an emergency medical services system; revise exception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |