GA HB370 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 32 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Council of Municipal Court Judges of Georgia, so as to authorize the council to create and administer savings plans and deferred compensation plans for its members; to provide for the manner of funding; to provide for limitations on funding and liability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Council of Municipal Court Judges of Georgia; create and administer savings and deferred compensation plans for members; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #277 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #204 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #204 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 188 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |