GA HB364 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of McDonough to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
McDonough, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Vote #88 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Vote #88 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 58 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-14 | House | House Hopper |