GA HB364 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use taxes, so as to provide for an exemption regarding the sale or use of an airplane flight simulation training device approved by the Federal Aviation Administration under Appendices A and B, 14 C.F.R. Part 60; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; airplane flight simulation training device; provide exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #321 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #232 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #232 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-05 | Act 169 | |
2009-05-05 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-11 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-10 | House First Readers |