GA HB358 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency powers, so as to provide when a declaration of a state of emergency or disaster by the Governor shall expire; to provide for extensions by the General Assembly; to provide for limitations on emergency powers; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management Act; provide when a declaration of a state of emergency or disaster by the Governor shall expire

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback