GA HB358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a nonbinding advisory referendum for the purpose of ascertaining whether the governing authority of the City of Morrow should seek a reduction in the $60,000.00 homestead exemption from City of Morrow ad valorem taxes for city purposes; to provide for legislative purposes and findings; to provide for procedures and requirements relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Morrow, City of; ad valorem tax for city purposes; provide for a nonbinding advisory referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 112 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |