GA HB357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration, operation, and sale of watercraft, so as to provide for the titling of certain vessels; to provide for procedures with regard to titling such vessels; to provide for legislative intent and findings; to provide a short title; to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding sales and use taxes, so as to provide for a cap on the sales and use tax on the purchase or lease of a vessel; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #720 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback