GA HB356 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Cobb County, approved June 19, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, Ex. Sess., p. 2075), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3691) and an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4048), so as to change the provisions relating to the compensation of the chairperson and the other commissioners of the board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Commissioners; compensation of chairperson and other commissioners; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 87 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |