GA HB354 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to require the State Board of Cemeterians and the State Board of Funeral Service to report suspected unlawful activity to the sheriff's office and the Attorney General; to require the Attorney General to provide notice of such suspected unlawful activity to the appropriate prosecuting attorney; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Cemeterians and Funeral Service; report suspected unlawful activity to the sheriff's office and the Attorney General; require
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Rep. Danny Mathis [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #384 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #288 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #77 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #288 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #77 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 189 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Postponed |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Hopper |