GA HB354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center, so as to reconstitute the Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center Authority; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for its membership, manner of appointment, terms of office, and powers and duties; to provide for exemption from taxation; to provide for venue; to provide for disposition of property; to exempt its property from levy and sale; to transfer certain assets and liabilities; to authorize the Department of Economic Development to contract with the authority for certain projects; to repeal certain laws; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center; reconstitute and authorize Department of Economic Development to contract for certain projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #738 (Y: 154 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #173 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V1
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-21HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-01-31SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback