GA HB353 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to driving on right side of roadway, overtaking and passing, and following too closely, so as to clarify what constitutes an obstruction for purposes of exceptions to when a vehicle is to drive on the right side of the roadway; to provide for proper operation of a motor vehicle when overtaking a bicyclist; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; clarify what constitutes an obstruction for purposes of exceptions to when a vehicle is to drive on the right side of roadway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #287 (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #59 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-04 Act 221
2021-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback