GA HB353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding insurance, so as to create the crime of staging a motor vehicle collision; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; create the crime of staging a motor vehicle collision
Sponsors
Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Marc Morris [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #380 (Y: 107 N: 55 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #292 (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #180 (Y: 93 N: 76 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #292 (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #180 (Y: 93 N: 76 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 40 | |
2019-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |