GA HB352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use tax, so as to change the sunset provision for the exemption for competitive projects of regional significance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; exemption for competitive projects of regional significance; change sunset provision
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] |
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #393 (Y: 155 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #335 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #113 (Y: 161 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #335 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #113 (Y: 161 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 277 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |