GA HB352 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL To be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 16 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to discovery, so as to change provisions relating to discovery in misdemeanor cases; to provide for a defendant to opt into reciprocal discovery similar to provisions in felony cases; to require the defendant to provide the prosecuting attorney with a list of witness and alibi information; to provide for procedure; to provide for sanctions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal procedure; change provisions relating to discovery in misdemeanor cases; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #164 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House Hopper |