GA HB35 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to provide for ethical policing; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 21 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state tort claims, so as to remove certain immunities from the actions of certain law enforcement officers; to provide that a law enforcement officer alleged to have committed misconduct or a violation of law while acting within the scope of his or her official duties or employment shall be subject to lawsuit or liability; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethical Policing Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-23HouseHouse Hopper
2020-12-02HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback