GA HB348 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Waycross, approved August 17, 1909 (Ga. L. 1909, p. 1456), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 23, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3513), so as to change the corporate limits of such municipality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waycross, City of; change corporate limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Effective Date
2017-03-24 Act 11
2017-03-24HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-03-24HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback