GA HB348 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Waycross, approved August 17, 1909 (Ga. L. 1909, p. 1456), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 23, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3513), so as to change the corporate limits of such municipality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Waycross, City of; change corporate limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Effective Date | |
2017-03-24 | Act 11 | |
2017-03-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |