GA HB342 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-7-3.2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the notice of cited deficiencies and imposition of sanctions for nursing homes or intermediate care homes, so as to provide that a violation of certain regulations shall not constitute negligence per se; to provide for limitations on advertisements that use or reference the results of federal or state surveys or inspections of nursing homes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nursing homes; violation of certain regulations shall not constitute negligence per se; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] |
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #364 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #237 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #217 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #237 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #217 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 203 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House Hopper |