GA HB340 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 2 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conditions of employment in elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for daily duty-free planning periods for teachers in grades six through 12; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; daily duty-free planning periods for teachers in grades six through twelve; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Amendment: Senate Vote #395 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Ams As Am: House Vote #372 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #363 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 31st: Senate Vote #362 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #209 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02 Effective Date 2023-07-01
2023-05-02 Act 256
2023-05-02HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2023-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2023-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2023-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2023-03-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64223
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/214223
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/216733
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/217230
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/220436
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/220383
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/219598
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/219705
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64223#21200
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64223#21653
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64223#21654
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64223#21618
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64223#21686

Bill Comments

feedback