GA HB340 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles, so as to change the manner of distribution of the proceeds of such tax; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; change manner of distribution of proceeds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #429 (Y: 98 N: 59 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #430 (Y: 151 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #386 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #228 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #228 (Y: 166 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 197
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 45th, 52nd, 21st
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 16th, 171st
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Insisted
2017-03-28HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-24SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/340
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165036.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166982.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167663.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169071.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170570.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170698.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15257
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15515
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15514

Bill Comments

feedback