GA HB338 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for system of supports and assistance for low-performing schools identified as in the greatest need of assistance; to provide for an Education Turnaround Advisory Council; to provide for the creation of the Joint Study Committee on the Establishment of a State Accreditation Process; to revise provisions relating to contracts for strategic waivers school systems; to revise provisions relating to charters for charter systems; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; system of supports and assistance for low-performing schools in the greatest need; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #342 (Y: 133 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #229 (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #230 (Y: 14 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #231 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #151 (Y: 138 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-04-27 Act 27
2017-04-27HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/338
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165027.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166661.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167236.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169019.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169354.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169389.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169443.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170167.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14964
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15260
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15259
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15258
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15291

Bill Comments

feedback