GA HB333 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, so as to revise the powers and duties of the Georgia Government Transparency and Campaign Finance Commission; to provide for and revise a short title; to revise definitions; to revise procedures for the initiation of complaints; to revise requirements for certain accounts, the disposition and expenditure of certain contributions, filings, registrations, and records of accounts; to revise how maximum contribution limits are implemented; to revise purposes requiring registration with the commission; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ethics in Government Act of 2021; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 160, Hb 333, Hb 498, Hb 574, Hb 575, & Hb 588: Senate Vote #358 (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #172 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #172 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Hopper |