GA HB332 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conservation and natural resources, so as to repeal and reenact Chapter 6A, relating to land conservation; to provide for a short title; to create the Georgia Outdoor Stewardship Trust Fund; to create funding mechanisms for the protection and preservation of conservation land and provide for their operation; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for definitions; to establish procedural requirements for approval of project proposals; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to provide for contingent repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Outdoor Stewardship Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #803 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #759 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #702 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #617 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 415
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/332
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164975.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167353.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174702.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177292.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178509.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178961.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15850
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16207
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16198
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16251

Bill Comments

feedback