GA HB33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-129 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to weapons carry license, gun safety information, temporary renewal permit, mandamus, and verification of license, so as to provide for an extension of time for the renewal of a weapons carry license or renewal license for certain service members serving on active duty outside the state; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Weapons carry license; extension of time for the renewal of a license for certain service members serving on active duty outside of the state; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #339 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #89 (Y: 148 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #339 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #89 (Y: 148 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 60 | |
2019-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House Hopper |