GA HB329 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, and computation of and exemptions from income taxes, so as to modify the rate of tax imposed on the Georgia taxable net income of individuals; to add Georgia income tax paid by an individual to his or her Georgia taxable income to the extent deducted in determining federal taxable income; to provide for a nonrefundable earned income tax credit; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; rate of tax imposed on the taxable net income of individuals; modify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #809 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #885 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #268 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 126 N: 40 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 367
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 52nd, 4th, 40th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 171st, 115th, 106th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Insisted
2017-03-28HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback