GA HB328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to telephone service general provisions, so as to establish a one-time right of way permit fee and reduce annual right of way use fees as due compensation paid to municipal authorities by telephone companies that do not have retail, end user customers located within the boundaries of the municipal authority; to provide certain notice requirements; to establish a civil penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public utilities; one-time right of way permit fee and reduce annual right of way use fees; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Amendment: Senate Vote #683 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Agree To Senate Am As Am: House Vote #600 (Y: 111 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #356 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #171 (Y: 119 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Agree To Senate Am As Am: House Vote #600 (Y: 111 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #356 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #171 (Y: 119 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 741 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-03 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Postponed |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Hopper |