GA HB327 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to prevent organized retail crime; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to selling and other trade practices, so as to provide for definitions; to provide for certain record-keeping and reporting requirements for the sale and purchase of stored value cards; to provide for certain record-keeping and reporting requirements for the sale of goods by third-party sellers on online marketplaces; to provide for penalties for failure to comply; to provide for confidentiality; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to theft, so as to define certain terms relating to retail property fencing, shoplifting, and refund fraud; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organized Retail Crime Prevention Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #427 (Y: 102 N: 63 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #380 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #239 (Y: 120 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2021-03-31SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-31SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback