GA HB327 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles, so as to change the manner for determining fair market value of motor vehicles subject to the tax; to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for an expiration period for temporary license plates; to require that applications be submitted to the county where the vehicle will be registered; to provide for extensions of the registration period under certain circumstances; to provide for conditional titles for certain motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; change manner for determining fair market value

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #537 (Y: 125 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-27SenateSenate Taken from Table
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-20HouseHouse Postponed
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback