GA HB324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to offenses against public health and morals, so as to provide for the production, manufacturing, and dispensing of low THC oil in this state; to provide for an exception to possession of certain quantities of low THC oil; to amend Chapter 11 of Title 2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to seeds and plants generally, so as to provide for an exception; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia's Hope Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #428 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #429 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #429 (Y: 147 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #153 (Y: 100 N: 65 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #154 (Y: 123 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-17 Act 27
2019-04-17HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 28th, 46th, 17th
2019-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 67th, 135th, 123rd
2019-03-29HouseHouse Insisted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Insisted
2019-03-29HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/324
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/181531.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183467.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183868.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186358.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187403.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187578.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16716
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17131
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17259
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17319
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17318

Bill Comments

feedback