GA HB323 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to identification and regulation of motor vehicles so as to modify the age for operation of certain commercial motor vehicle operators; to amend Code Section 40-1-167, relating to required information on license plates of limousines, so as to modify provisions relating to requirements on limousine license plates; to amend Code Section 44-1-13, relating to the removal of improperly parked cars or trespassing personal property, concurrent jurisdiction, procedure, automatic surveillance prohibited, and penalties, so as to authorize the Department of Public Safety to assess an undetermined application fee for towing companies; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; age for operation of certain commercial motor vehicle operators; modify
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #353 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #443 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #186 (Y: 161 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #443 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #186 (Y: 161 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 268 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-12 | House | House Hopper |