GA HB323 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the death penalty generally, so as to extend the period of review for the Supreme Court's consideration of applications for pretrial proceedings in cases in which the death penalty is sought; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Death penalty cases; Supreme Court; pretrial proceedings; extend review period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #815 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #230 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #230 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-24 | Act 452 | |
2010-05-24 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |