GA HB316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; definitions; provide for uniform equipment and ballot marking devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #233 (Y: 101 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #183 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #184 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #185 (Y: 21 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #186 (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Vote #78 (Y: 101 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02 Effective Date
2019-04-02 Act 24
2019-04-02HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-03-29HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-14HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-13SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-13SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-13SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-26HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/316
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/181510.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182420.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182952.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183955.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/184671.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16874
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16871
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16877

Bill Comments

feedback