GA HB315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to provide for certain agreements from consultants who enter into contracts or arrangements with counties, municipalities, and other local governmental entities to prepare or develop specifications or requirements for bids, requests for proposals, procurement orders, or purchasing orders; to provide a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; certain agreements from consultants who enter into contracts or arrangements to prepare or develop requirements for bids; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #378 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #267 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #205 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-17 Act 26
2019-04-17HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback