GA HB313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn Bill/Res Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to dogs, so as to require the transferor of any dog to provide an informational document including dog bite statistics as part of the transaction; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Logan's Law; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn Bill/Res Consideration
2017-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback