GA HB311 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 21 of Title 50, Title 36, Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 23, and Code Section 5-6-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to waiver of sovereign immunity as to actions ex contractu and state tort claims, provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, conventional quia timet, and judgments and rulings deemed directly appealable, procedure for review of judgments, orders, or decisions not subject to direct appeal, scope of review, hearings in criminal cases involving a capital offense for which death penalty is sought, and appeals involving nonmonetary judgments in child custody cases; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; waiver of sovereign immunity as to actions ex contractu and state tort claims; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #377 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #245 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #178 (Y: 168 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V5
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback