GA HB31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2019, and ending June 30, 2020; to make and provide such appropriations for the operation of the State government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2019 - June 30, 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #285 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #316 (Y: 165 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #232 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #98 (Y: 155 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Effective Date
2019-05-10 Act 319
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-28HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 49th, 30th, 4th
2019-03-25HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-25HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 116th, 159th, 47th
2019-03-25HouseHouse Insisted
2019-03-25SenateSenate Insisted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-25HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-25SenateSenate Transmitted House
2019-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback