GA HB31 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-24 - Act 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a nonbinding advisory referendum for the purpose of ascertaining whether the electors of Jefferson County desire the Jefferson County Board of Commissioners to levy an additional ad valorem tax for the purpose of realizing additional tax revenue to provide payment for Jefferson County Hospital Authority's services and facilities and to retire hospital debt; to provide for legislative purposes and findings; to provide for procedures and requirements relating thereto; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jefferson County; Board of Commissioners; levy additional ad valorem tax; provide nonbinding advisory referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-23 - Senate Vote #10 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House Vote #7 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-24 Act 1
2017-01-24HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-01-24HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-01-23SenateSenate Transmitted House
2017-01-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-01-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-12HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2017-01-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-01-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback