GA HB308 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, computation, rate, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to revise the tax credit for the rehabilitation of historic structures; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for a sunset date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; revise tax credit for rehabilitation of historic structures; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #388 (Y: 118 N: 46 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #391 (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #286 (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #197 (Y: 147 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #391 (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #286 (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #197 (Y: 147 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 211 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House Hopper |