GA HB307 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to magistrate courts, so as to provide for jurisdiction of such courts; to provide for filing certain documents electronically; to amend Chapter 11 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to abandoned motor vehicles, so as to repeal Article 1, relating to abandoned and derelict vehicles, and to enact a new Article 1; to amend Article 5 of Chapter 12 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disposition of unclaimed property, so as to provide for proceeds from the sale of an abandoned motor vehicle after satisfaction of a lien to be deposited with the commissioner of revenue; to provide for publication of "Georgia Unclaimed Property List"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned Motor Vehicle Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #405 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #361 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #183 (Y: 167 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback