GA HB305 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the practice of massage therapy, so as to revise a definition; to revise a provision relating to continuing education requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; massage therapy; revise a definition
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #702 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #85 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #85 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 808 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House Hopper |