GA HB305 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-7-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to in whom parental power lies, how such power is lost, and recover for homicide of child, so as to add stepparents and former stepparents to the category of third parties who may be awarded custody of a child in certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Domestic relations; category of third parties who may be awarded custody in certain circumstances; add stepparents
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #94 (Y: 133 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50409 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/164824 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50409#14877 |