GA HB304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Effective Date 2022-03-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to provide for a tax credit for medical equipment and supplies manufacturers and pharmaceutical and medicine manufacturers; to provide for definitions; to provide for conditions and limitations on certain tax credits; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; medical equipment and supplies manufacturers and pharmaceutical and medicine manufacturers; provide tax credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-17 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #688 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #686 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #676 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-18 Effective Date 2022-03-18
2022-03-18 Act 567
2022-03-18HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2022-03-17HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2022-03-17SenateSenate Transmitted House
2022-03-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2022-03-17SenateSenate Third Read
2022-03-17SenateSenate Engrossed
2022-03-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2022-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2022-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2022-03-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-03-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2022-03-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-04HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback