GA HB304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the Magistrate Court of Putnam County, approved March 12, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 3788), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4159), so as to revise the number, manner of selection, and compensation of the judges of the magistrate court; to authorize up to two other part-time magistrates; to provide for conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Putnam County; Magistrate Court; revise number, manner of selection, and compensation of the judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #67 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 12 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House Hopper |