GA HB303 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Commission on Family Violence, so as to change provisions relating to the terms of commission members and members' qualifications to serve; to provide for expenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Commission on Family Violence; terms and qualifications of members; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #166 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 252 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |