GA HB30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2018, and ending June 30, 2019, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 1EX, approved November 17, 2018, so as to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the State government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2018 - June 30, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #57 (Y: 155 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #52 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #44 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Vote #23 (Y: 166 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Effective Date
2019-03-12 Act 3
2019-03-12HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-03-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-02-22SenateSenate Transmitted House
2019-02-22SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-02-22HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-22HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-02-21SenateSenate Transmitted House
2019-02-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-21SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback